THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE MYELIN PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up to meet the goals of funding viable research into all demyelinating diseases while also offering support and information to all thise affected by these diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 October 1990: Standard registration
- 28 October 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 28 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1106008 Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity
- MYELIN PROJECT (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.49k | £1.80k | £2.40k | £1.45k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £24.44k | £8.98k | £9.05k | £11.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND ACCELERATE MEDICAL RESEARCH ON THERAPIES CONCERNING MYELIN DISEASES WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON METHODS TO RECONSTITUTE OR REGENERATE THE WHITE MATTER IN THE PERIPHERAL AND CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEMS AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window