Accounts and annual returns THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF WINSTON LODGE

Charity number: 1000632
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2007 24 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2006 29 December 2006 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 29 December 2005 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2004 27 January 2005 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not Required