THE LINDA AND MICHAEL WEINSTEIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to other charitable institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL WEINSTEIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
LINDA WEINSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.97k | £68.82k | £69.90k | £18.11k | £31.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.00k | £70.48k | £118.29k | £53.00k | £47.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
Denver Court
132 Hendon Lane
London
N3 3RH
- Phone:
- 02083461257
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window