Resolve West LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resolve West is an independent, charity with over 37 years experience of providing confidential services to enable people to resolve conflict, and repair harm and for offenders to understand impact of actions and to have an opportunity to make amends. Our services are provided to residents across Avon & Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £37,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £211,016 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 October 1990: Standard registration
- BRISTOL MEDIATION (Previous name)
- BRISTOL MEDIATION (Previous name)
- BRISTOL MEDIATION-NEW APPROACHES TO CONFLICT RESOLUTION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silvia Laraia | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucretia Gray | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martine Kim Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Iain Large | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hughes | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Elaine Maycock | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.83k | £346.47k | £350.96k | £391.01k | £316.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.41k | £326.33k | £346.13k | £344.86k | £344.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £296.36k | £45.00k | £225.95k | £45.00k | £37.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.50k | £40.12k | £45.01k | £191.44k | £211.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 11/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 DEC 2017 as amended on 05 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CITIZENS AND COMMUNITIES IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES AND WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS REPAIRING HARM BY RESTORATIVE JUSTICE WORKING WITH VICTIMS OF CRIME AND PERPETRATORS OF HARM; AND RESOLVING CONFLICT BY MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE ANY SUCH DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Coop
38-42 Chelsea Road
Bristol
Bristol
BS5 6AF
- Phone:
- 01179415379
- Email:
- info@resolvewest.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window