GREAT PARKS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NHS/M.S. SOCIETY EXERCISE CLASSES, MEETINGS, LOCAL COMMUNITY EVENTS AND LOCAL COMMUNITY FACILITIES.TUCK SHOP, DA SUPPORT, ESSENTIALS SHOP/SOCIAL SUPERMARKET, PARENT-LED TODDLERS GROUP, AFTER SCHOOL DROP IN CLUB, COMMUNITY GARDEN, INFORMATION ADVICE AND GUIDANCE CLINICS, HOLIDAY FUN CLUBS, TORBAY COUNCIL POLLING STATION, NHS UNPAID CARERS INFORMATION POINT, TAI CHI CLASSES, COFFEE MORNING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 26 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNY DAY | Chair | 26 October 1990 |
|
|
||||
Gary Redman | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LARAINE DAY | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.93k | £32.51k | £41.29k | £98.47k | £61.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.17k | £27.85k | £36.87k | £80.21k | £78.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.83k | £13.50k | £13.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT PARKS ESTATE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH AY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES
Area of benefit
PAIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Queen Elizabeth Drive
Paignton
TQ3 3YP
- Phone:
- 07816392489
- Email:
- juliebose26@gmail.com
- Website:
-
greatparkscommunity.co.uk/great-parks-community-centre/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window