Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF TITHEBARN BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1000681
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 January 2025 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window