ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF TITHEBARN BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1000681
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN TITHEBARN MASONIC HOME

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,712
Total expenditure: £20,028

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF THE TITHEBARN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER TAYLOR HOLT Trustee 04 February 2024
None on record
ALAN RAY SECRETARY Trustee 05 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.39k £78.07k £12.52k £13.50k £12.71k
Total expenditure £20.82k £28.47k £52.77k £12.41k £20.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 January 2025 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tithebarn Residential Home
Moor Lane
Crosby
LIVERPOOL
L23 2SH
Phone:
0151 924 3683