Financial history SOUTHPORT FLOWER SHOW

Charity number: 1000698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.34m £106.67k £227.22k £1.37m £1.26m
Total expenditure £1.32m £385.46k £254.79k £1.17m £1.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.80k £16.95k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £940 N/A N/A £2.95k £1.70k
Income - Other trading activities £422.72k N/A N/A £395.18k £375.57k
Income - Charitable activities £823.36k N/A N/A £842.61k £761.93k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £420 N/A N/A £133 £2.35k
Income - Other £89.71k N/A N/A £125.61k £116.02k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £941.26k N/A N/A £817.16k £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £379.73k N/A N/A £355.90k £354.96k
Expenditure - Governance £12.25k N/A N/A £27.32k £17.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £44.72k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0