THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH IN BRAMHALL DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 October 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 06 November 1990: Standard registration
- 02 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/10/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 October 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST THE PUBLIC BY THE REBUILDING, REFURBISHMENT AND RENEWAL OF THE CHURCH PREMISES AT BRAMHALL LANE SOUTH, BRAMHALL 2) TO CONTINUE TO PROVIDE FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
BRAMHALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window