CODA INTERNATIONAL TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CODA's aim is to develop the skills and resources necessary within established community-based organisations in the South to bring about positive and sustainable social and economic changes to the lives of the poorest and most marginalised communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ghana
- Zambia
Governance
- 01 November 1990: Standard registration
- 21 October 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CODA (Working name)
- CODA INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.02k | £209.40k | £15.90k | £6.07k | £882 | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.92k | £320.57k | £24.23k | £1.02k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 25 September 2019 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FURTHER EDUCATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN BY ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING THEM TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICE AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN VARIOUS PARTS OF THE WORLD AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window