Financial history THE DORSET GARDENS TRUST

Charity Number: 1000743
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.48k £9.86k £17.14k £18.38k £26.83k
Total expenditure £34.15k £14.82k £15.94k £18.19k £16.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A