Trustees THE DORSET GARDENS TRUST
Charity Number: 1000743

Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCILLE ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Madeleine Carsley | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
THE HONOURABLE HENRY NOEL KENELM DIGBY | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr HAZEL ANNE ATHERTON | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIR WILLIAM JOHN EDWARD HANHAM | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
COUNTESS OF SANDWICH | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|||||
JOAN MARY DALLYN LLB | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS CLARKE | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HEDIN | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR R BURDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.