THE WROXTON ABBEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of education at Wroxton College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Avaltroni | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Barra | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Mabbitt | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anne Pike | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS DAVID JAMES BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £5 | £0 | £150 | £215 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.10k | £1.06k | £0 | £0 | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES (WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE) BEING CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WROXTON ABBEY
WROXTON
BANBURY
OXON
OX15 6PX
- Phone:
- 01295730551
- Email:
- admin@wroxton-college.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window