THE STEVENAGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support charities, local groups and individuals in Stevenage and the immediate surrounding area with small grants. Money is raised from corporate membership subscription, fund raising and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON JOHNSON | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON NEAL HOUSTON | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER BRADLEY CLARKSON | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR BRUCE | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID GREENALL | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE LOUISE CARROLL | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas Edward McQueen Mr | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN CASE | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEANNETTE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT JOHN STEWART | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR MIKE PHOENIX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.11k | £162.32k | £184.39k | £134.12k | £174.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.96k | £131.17k | £209.43k | £153.68k | £180.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH OCTOBER 1990 as amended on 12 Sept 2024 as amended on 29 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the Community in the Borough of Stevenage and the surrounding villages. 2.2 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word "charitable" or the words "charitable purposes" in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stevenage Community Trust
Stewart House
Primett Road
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 3EE
- Phone:
- 01438525390
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window