THE GRANGE PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school providing education and care for the under fives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £267,471 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 06 November 1990: Standard registration
- 14 May 2025: Funds received from 1025860 CRAWSHAY PRE-SCHOOL
- GRANGE PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nazia Zaman | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Matthews | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roseanne Munns | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danae Tegg | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Molyneux | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.37k | £228.14k | £194.73k | £200.48k | £303.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.80k | £191.73k | £176.28k | £217.16k | £270.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £178.86k | £196.83k | £158.27k | £154.30k | £267.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY 1) TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISTYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH THE PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART 2) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN 3) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SOUTHCOTE, READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grange United Reformed Church
Circuit Lane
READING
RG30 3HD
- Phone:
- 01189568528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window