THAXTED COMMUNITY MINIBUS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i Minibus provides free transport for elderly to and from their residence to local shops and market. Applicable to Thaxted and surrounding area on a weekly basis.. ii Available to local organisations i.e. scouts, youth club, local church groups etc. by donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 07 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP LEEDER | Chair | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £1.57k | £1.65k | £2.49k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21k | £3.11k | £2.48k | £4.16k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A NON-PROFIT MAKING COMMUNITY BUS SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF: A) THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THAXTED AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BY REASON OF OLD AGE OR DISABILITY B) CHARITABLE GROUPS OR ORGANISATIONS IN THE SAID AREA C) NON-CHARITABLE GROUPS OR ORGANISATIONS IN THE SAID AREA WHICH HAVE NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BY REASON OF BEING LOCATED IN AN ISOLATED RURAL AREA
Area of benefit
THAXTED AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 The Mead
Thaxted
DUNMOW
CM6 2PU
- Phone:
- 01371830943
- Email:
- mick@mcmxliv.myzen.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window