THE NATIONAL PRINTING HERITAGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving historic printing equipment, machinery and archives; helping museums to store and conserve such material; giving advice to museums, individuals, commercial and government bodies about access to, and preservation of, such material; lobbying for access to, and preservation of, historic material relating to printing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 November 1990: Standard registration
- 15 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £622 | £367 | £426 | £564 | £462 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94k | £3.15k | £1.39k | £1.11k | £412 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 23 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 23 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 26 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING A FUND FOR THE PRESERVATION OF MACHINERY AND RELEVANT EQUIPMENT AS USED IN THE PRINTING INDUSTRY AND RELATED INDUSTRIES AND BY MAKING DISCRETIONARY GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES HAVING A SIMILAR PURPOSE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window