Financial history GWENT BALLET THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1000855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £724.80k £710.91k £656.80k £623.55k £774.20k
Total expenditure £655.04k £527.88k £709.90k £758.14k £688.84k
Income from government contracts £39.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £353.78k £324.62k £112.18k £365.93k £436.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £37.07k £41.45k £26.84k £100.30k £194.34k
Income - Other trading activities £38.28k £0 £3.74k £6.28k £5.88k
Income - Charitable activities £649.45k £669.10k £626.03k £515.64k £572.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £357 £185 £1.33k £1.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £655.04k £527.88k £709.90k £758.14k £688.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £650 £650 £950 £0 £6.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0