NEWTON SOLNEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1000857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall providing venue for activities for benefit of local inhabitants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,810
Total expenditure: £17,796

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Mears Chair 26 April 2022
None on record
Karen Brittan Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Evelyn Charles Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
WENDY MAUREEN POOLE Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER PAUL KITTO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.82k £15.89k £26.02k £16.93k £16.81k
Total expenditure £14.91k £8.01k £7.70k £11.97k £17.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £232 £10.00k £17.67k N/A £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 November 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GREENBANK
BRETBY LANE
NEWTON SOLNEY
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE15 0RY
Phone:
01283703228
Website:

No information available