SHROPSHIRE UNION FLY-BOAT RESTORATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Completed restoration of only remaining horse drawn Shropshire Union Fly Boat 'Saturn' in 2005. Promoting horse boating and using the boat as an educational resource for schools and the local communities along the Shropshire Union Canal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Denbighshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 12 November 1990: Standard registration
- THE SATURN PROJECT (Working name)
- SYMBOL RESTORATION SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Denton Grundy | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Sarah Gaughan | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Bozson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ray | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Grundy | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BOB JERVIS | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.33k | £4.40k | £5.13k | £5.59k | £14.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69k | £5.99k | £4.21k | £5.59k | £4.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH OCTOBER 1990. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORICAL AND INDUSTRIAL SIGNIFICANCE OF THE INLAND WATERWAYS AND NAVIGABLE ESTUARIES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM 2) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF THE SHROPSHIRE UNION FLY-BOAT "SYMBOL"
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn Cottage
School Lane
Audlem
CREWE
CW3 0BA
- Phone:
- 07737412673
- Email:
- info@saturnflyboat.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window