SALEM CHAPEL FUND

Charity Number: 1000861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,097
Total expenditure: £4,125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD JONES Trustee 26 October 2012
CRUGYBAR VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
RHIDIAN WYN LLOYD Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
ANN JONES Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
ELIZABETH MARY THOMAS Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
ARWEL EVANS Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
DYFAN EVANS Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
HILLARY MARIAN JONES Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
AILEEN DAVIES Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
ELGAN LLOYD JONES Trustee
NEUADD BRO FANA
Received: On time
DAVID BENJAMIN TREVOR EVANS Trustee
None on record
EVAN TEGWYN LLOYD Trustee
None on record
EIRY ELUNED JONES Trustee
None on record
DAVID AELWYN EVANS Trustee
None on record
JOHN ELGAN LLOYD EVANS Trustee
THE LAMPETER WELSH PONY AND COB ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.78k £4.95k £4.68k £5.23k £6.10k
Total expenditure £3.01k £2.25k £2.72k £3.13k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 November 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PENYBONT
PUMPSAINT
LLANWRDA
SA19 8YU
Phone:
01558650477
Website:

No information available