PLATFFORM FOR CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Platfform is the charity for mental health and social change. We work to have a lasting positive impact with people experiencing challenges with their mental health, with over 100 projects and services across Wales and the UK. We live by our values of being connected, compassionate, brave and curious in everything we do, and we believe deeply in our vision of sustainable wellbeing for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£16,366,684
Donations and legacies | £1.78m | |
Charitable activities | £11.94m | |
Other trading activities | £2.65m | |
Investments | £20 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,505,814
Raising funds | £1.46k | |
Charitable activities | £12.43m | |
Other | £2.07m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,714,588 from 33 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.43m | |
Retained for future use | £1.86m |
People

464 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- GOFAL HOUSING (Working name)
- GOFAL HOUSING TRUST (Working name)
- GOFAL CYMRU (Previous name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne-Louise Tonge | Chair | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Newton | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Lelliott | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mikel Charles Mellick | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Green | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mark Hapgood | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jamie Dowson Loughran | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stewart John Davison | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.64m | £10.32m | £11.77m | £12.89m | £16.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.07m | £9.95m | £11.94m | £13.22m | £14.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.68m | £5.07m | £6.30m | £6.59m | £6.71m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.40m | £6.75k | £12.28k | £11.75k | £1.78m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.53m | £1.25m | £1.83m | £2.66m | £2.65m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.70m | £8.85m | £9.93m | £10.22m | £11.94m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.78k | £1.20k | £0 | £0 | £20 | |
|
Income - Other | £6.76k | £206.34k | £4.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.95m | £8.74m | £10.74m | £11.32m | £12.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.97k | £2.58k | £693 | £6.75k | £1.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £34.59k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.12m | £1.21m | £1.20m | £1.89m | £2.07m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.80m | £842.50k | £904.60k | £1.38m | £1.29m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.37m | £4.05m | £3.82m | £3.84m | £5.57m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.83m | £2.03m | £2.04m | £2.85m | £2.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1997, 28 MARCH 2001, 28 SEPTEMBER 2005, 16 MAY 2006, 8 OCTOBER 2007 AND 24 MARCH 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2015 as amended on 17 Dec 2018 as amended on 06 Aug 2019 as amended on 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(1) To relieve the needs of people with mental health problems, those at risk of developing mental health problems or suffering from detrimental health risk behaviours and other vulnerable or disadvantaged persons by: a) the provision of housing and other associated amenities designed or adapted to meet the disabilities and requirements of such persons; b) the provision of services, advice, support and opportunities which support the mental wellbeing of such persons; and c) advancing the education of the public on the causes and effects of mental health problems and detrimental health risk behaviours. (2) In this Article: a) “detrimental health risk behaviour” means any form of individual behaviour which is harmful and self-detrimental, has a strong negative influence on mental health and which is attributable to poor psychological and social wellbeing for whatever reason, including substance misuse and other risks to individual and public mental health; b) “vulnerable” refers to persons (adults or children) who have, or may have, need of community services by reason of a mental or physical disability, age, or illness; and c) “disadvantaged” refers to a recognised social or welfare disadvantage.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WALES AND ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Platfform
Beaufort House
Beaufort Road
Morriston
Swansea
SA6 8JG
- Phone:
- 01656647722
- Email:
- connect@platfform.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window