GUILDEN SUTTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guilden Sutton Pre-School provides daily sessions for children between the ages of 2 1/2 and 4.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £48,891 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 14 November 1990: Standard registration
- MARIGOLD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Dixon | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susie Harrington | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Bethany Coffey | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Roberts | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cora Thorne | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Dixon | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faye Tucker | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.01k | £45.20k | £44.18k | £59.80k | £62.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.59k | £44.44k | £50.76k | £60.00k | £60.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £37.03k | £46.79k | £48.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.59k | £37.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 18TH 1990 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCTOBER 1996 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guilden Sutton Village Hall
Summerfield Road
Guilden Sutton
Chester
Cheshire
CH3 7SW
- Phone:
- 07717942843
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window