THE ANGLO RUSSIAN CHILDREN APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer suffering relief to children being treated for cancer in the UK and particularly in London. To provide financial support to improve living conditions and education in orphanages in Russia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Russia
Governance
- 16 November 1990: Standard registration
- 05 April 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SAVE RUSSIAN CHILDREN FUND (Previous name)
- THE RUSSIAN CHILDREN FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 29 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 11 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 29 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 20 May 2013 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED ON 27TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF SICKNESS NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES CLOTHING AND FOOD. 2)TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF THE DEPRIVED OR POOR ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE PARTICULARLY RUSSIA AND THE SOVIET REPUBLICS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window