QUEEN VICTORIA HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport & Recreational, theatre productions, meetings. Parties, Wedding venue
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OUNDLE TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.66k | £20.20k | £19.98k | £38.12k | £22.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.93k | £15.35k | £23.56k | £31.05k | £26.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.95k | £10.00k | £11.17k | £26.09k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH MARCH 1904 AND SCHEME OF 25TH JANUARY 1946
Charitable objects
TO PERMIT THE PREMISES TO BE USED FOR CONCERTS, LECTURES OF ANY NATURE WHATSOEVER OR AS AND FOR THE PUBLIC LIBRARY AND READING ROOM, EITHER GRATIS OR SUBJECT TO ANY CHARGE AND GENERALLY IN SUCH MANNER AS IS DEEMED MOST ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE INHABITANTS OF OUNDLE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AND MOST APPROPRIATE TO COMMEMORATE THE LONG AND GLORIOUS REIGN OF HER LATE MAJESTY QUEEN VICTORIA
Area of benefit
OUNDLE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLETTON HOUSE
GLAPTHORN ROAD
OUNDLE
PETERBOROUGH
ENGLAND
PE8 4JA
- Phone:
- 01832 272055
- Email:
- admin@oundle.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window