Financial history WILTSHIRE LAW CENTRE

Charity Number: 1000950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.22k £213.02k £291.00k £634.97k £970.48k
Total expenditure £130.00k £145.77k £315.31k £467.32k £654.73k
Income from government contracts £113.41k £58.09k N/A N/A £655.76k
Income from government grants N/A £35.22k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £699 £150
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £477.59k £769.45k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £156.67k £64.34k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £10 £4.06k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £132.49k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £467.32k £654.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0