SURVIVORS NETWORK (SUSSEX)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services and support for women who have experienced any form of sexual abuse or sexual violence including a telephone/e-mail helpline, Counselling, advocacy/practical support, drop in service, theraputic group work. Regular newsletter and library service. We also provide training for professionals and campaign to end the future abuse of women and children and lessen the taboo around sexual abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 November 1990: Standard registration
- 03 October 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 October 2013: Funds transferred to 1144878 THE SURVIVORS' NETWORK LIMITED
- SURVIVORS' NETWORK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.20k | £87.71k | £161.67k | £169.33k | £42.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.28k | £86.98k | £153.63k | £183.85k | £37.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 24 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 24 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 12 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 30 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 17 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 31ST OCTOBER 1990, AND 3RD OCTOBER 1994, 10TH FEBRUARY 2000 AND 3 DECEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND / OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF WOMEN, OVER THE AGE OF 16, WHO HAVE SURVIVED SEXUAL VIOLENCE INCLUDING RAPE, SEXUAL ASSAULT AND/OR CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND ADVICE FOR ALL WOMEN SERVICE USERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window