JOSEPH CLARKE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide such special benefits of any kind not normally provided by the Local Education Authority for Joseph Clarke School for the visually impaired of London E4 9PP. To educate and assist visually impaired young persons through their leisure time activities to develop their physical mental and spiritual capacities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 14 November 1990: Standard registration
- 24 January 2025: Funds received from 262475 WANSTEAD AND WOODFORD ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK JAMES SMITH | Chair |
|
||||||
Isobel Bidder | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Reece Bidder | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Chipperfield | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY WILLIAM HOOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.27k | £22.36k | £19.99k | £55.90k | £50.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.45k | £14.10k | £24.77k | £27.88k | £13.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
A) PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR JOSEPH CLARKE SCHOOL OF VINCENT ROAD HIGHAMS PARK LONDON E4 9PP OR OTHER MAINTAINED SCHOOLS OR UNITS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST WHOSE PRIME PURPOSE IS THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED B) TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST VISUALLY HANDICAPPED YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT PROVIDE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST CENTRES FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING A BRAILLE LIBRARY AND RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR SHORT TERM TRAINING
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 ENDLEBURY ROAD
LONDON
E4 6QB
- Phone:
- 02085292186
- Email:
- end63@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window