THE FRIENDS OF TYRRELLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to help finance activities and projects to enhance learning. Any excess funds go to finance extra equipment on the school wish list.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 15 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Priest | Chair | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dinwiddy | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Knight | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Martin | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Wendy Woolman | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.07k | £14.10k | £10.62k | £26.12k | £27.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.76k | £14.97k | £8.87k | £21.96k | £23.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST MARCH 1977 AMENDED 31ST MAY 1978, 12TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT TYRRELLS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Springfield Park Road
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6EB
- Phone:
- 07854197951
- Email:
- friendsoftyrrells@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
tyrrellsprimary.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window