Linked charities WALDEN SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1000981
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 13 AUGUST 1877 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEEDS DATED 5 OCTOBER 1994 AND 30 MARCH 2000, AND AN ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 APRIL 2003. AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2002
Charitable objects
SEE SCHEDULE OF ORDER DATED 9 APRIL 2003.
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN, ESSEX
Registration history
  • 19 May 2003 : Standard registration
  • 07 September 2023 : Removed