Financial history CHRISTCHURCH AND DISTRICT ARTS

Charity Number: 1000984
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.88k £15.17k £16.73k £5.33k £34.65k
Total expenditure £14.83k £13.48k £15.38k £11.25k £14.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £17.67k