Accounts and annual returns BARNET AND DISTRICT AFFILIATED SYNAGOGUE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1000987
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 13 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 13 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 25 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 07 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 07 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 13 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 13 July 2006 On Time