HAMPSHIRE BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HBA advises and helps those who have problems with invertebrates and, in particular, honey bees. Also hornets, especially the Asian hornet, wasps, and bumblebees . It provides swarm collection and information to non beekeepers. It holds an annual convention, a honey show, and hosts a web site available to the public. Members educate the public and visit schools to talk on honey bees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 November 1990: Standard registration
- HAMPSHIRE BEEKEPERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dylan Gussman | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cooper | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Baxter | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Holloway | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Ali Everest | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Latham | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ray | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Grimes | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Skinner | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Frost | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Margetts | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.75k | £8.00k | £8.39k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £7.93k | £6.78k | £7.48k | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH OCTOBER 1990 as amended on 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING IN HAMPSHIRE AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Hocombe Road
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO53 5SP
- Phone:
- 02380253239
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window