HARINGEY DISABILITY ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Haringey
Governance
- 22 November 1990: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- HARINGEY CONSORTIUM OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND CARERS (Previous name)
- HARINGEY DISABILITIES CONSORTIUM (Previous name)
- HARINGEY DISABILITIES CONSORTIUM LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.13k | £187.43k | £149.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.11k | £214.27k | £127.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 03 April 2008 | 63 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 06 March 2007 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 06 March 2007 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 11 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 11 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCOR 31 MAY 1990, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME 12 DECEMBER 1999 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2007 ANDSPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JULY 1993, 10 FEBRUARY 1999, 22 OCTOBER 2003, 6 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, MENTAL HEALTH AND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, OR LONG TERM ILLNESS TO MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PREVENTATIVE AND OTHER PRACTICAL SUPPORT SERVICES
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window