STEVENAGE MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SMCC is the representative body for the Muslims in the East and North Herts. The Charity is a Mosque and a community centre, providing facilities for community services, Islamic education for children and classes for learning the Holy Qur'an and Arabic. It organises discussions, lectures and meetings on religious topics to the community and accommodates local schools for religious education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR SARFRAZ AWAN FRCS | Chair |
|
||||||
MUDASSAR AHMED | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr SYED ISHRAT ALI ZAIDI | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Imran Abdulkareem | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farrukh Sheikh | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Forhadul Islam Chowdhury | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ISLAM MAJID | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Shahid Anis Khan | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED SALAM KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.34k | £154.31k | £261.02k | £110.57k | £205.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.58k | £135.54k | £126.77k | £248.48k | £202.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 December 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 December 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JULY 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CONGREGATIONAL PRAYERS AND BY ARRANGING FUNERAL AND MARRIAGE SERVICES 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM 3) TO RELIEVE THE SICK AND ELDERLY AND THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF FINANCIAL NEED
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SISHES
VARDON ROAD
STEVENAGE
SG1 5PZ
- Phone:
- 07810007531
- Email:
- info@smcc786.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window