Financial history THE BRAIN TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1001012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £152.38k £35.55k £86.14k £21.28k £62.43k
Total expenditure £123.86k £73.13k £80.54k £71.11k £58.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A