FINCHALE TRAINING COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rehabilitation of persons who are disabled permanently or temporarily and persons with special physical or mental health needs, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of educational and vocational training; and the relief of unemployment in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income:
£1,111,588
Donations and legacies | £100.54k | |
Charitable activities | £757.16k | |
Other trading activities | £142.52k | |
Investments | £4.23k | |
Other | £107.13k |
Total expenditure:
£1,519,830
Raising funds | £53.76k | |
Charitable activities | £1.47m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,144 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £248,835 from 6 government contract(s) and £119,870 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £53.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.47m |
People

31 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Andrew Knights | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Trevor Harrison | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward George Alexander Gorringe | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Hardy | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Goddard | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £680.04k | £942.60k | £2.30m | £780.53k | £1.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72m | £1.45m | £1.76m | £1.66m | £1.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.93k | £87.64k | £364.57k | £285.17k | £248.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £28.97k | £119.87k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.05k | £23.60k | £12.09k | £23.98k | £100.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £261.82k | £279.91k | £420.06k | £323.69k | £142.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £379.86k | £623.41k | £520.59k | £418.20k | £757.16k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £20.86k | £6.83k | £6.80k | £9.32k | £4.23k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.45k | £8.85k | £1.34m | £5.34k | £107.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £15.11k | £9.00k | £2.00k | £65.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.67m | £1.36m | £1.57m | £1.64m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £44.41k | £88.29k | £14.87k | £22.39k | £53.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.17k | £16.32k | £12.30k | £14.68k | £74.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £67.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.42k | £2.40k | £2.27k | £2.58k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £169.88k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.92m | £3.80m | £149.88k | £154.97k | £124.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £288.66k | £281.99k | £285.37k | £294.50k | £303.03k | |
|
Other assets | £1.23m | £914.96k | £5.22m | £4.22m | £3.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£863.49k | -£1.03m | -£1.17m | -£467.00k | -£158.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £197.79k | £219.41k | £269.63k | £306.96k | £325.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/07/1990 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 DEC 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
1. OBJECTS 1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1.1. THE REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE DISABLED PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY AND PERSONS WITH SPECIAL PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING; AND 1.1.2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Richard Annand VC House
Unit 18 Mandale Park
Belmont Industrial Estate
DURHAM
DH1 1TH
- Phone:
- 01913862634
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window