HINCKLEY SPECIAL NEEDS INTEGRATION PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social and recreational activities for children, young people and adults with learning disabilities from 3 years of age. Covering after school, weekend and holiday periods, to reduce isolation and improve confidence and social skill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £67,066 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 27 November 1990: Standard registration
- 08 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1162574 SNIPS HINCKLEY
- S N I P S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.66k | £133.26k | £110.67k | £110.14k | £105.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.22k | £145.35k | £119.98k | £121.43k | £110.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.16k | £67.07k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 23 February 2016 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 20 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 13 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 25 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 14TH MAY 1990 AS AMENDED ON 26TH FEBRUARY 1998 AND 16 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WITH A PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTY BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window