JARROW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purposes of the Women's Institute area: To advance the education of women and girls; to promote sustainable development for the public benefit; to advance health for the public benefit and, to advance citizenship for the public benefit by the promotion of civic responsibility and volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 12 November 1990: Standard registration
- HEDWORTHFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- JARROW HEDWORTHFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIRLEY BUTTERFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Beryl Bradley | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona O'Neil | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JOBSON | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Tucker | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Boulding | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNA McKIVITT | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA MARGARET PHIPPEN | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FULLERTON | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|||||
AURIEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27k | £563 | £4.92k | £5.33k | £18.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.69k | £1.69k | £3.06k | £4.13k | £18.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ALREADY LODGED AS AMENDED 12 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Weymouth Drive
HOUGHTON LE SPRING
Tyne And Wear
DH4 7TZ
- Phone:
- 07855723181
- Email:
- Jarrowwi@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window