Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CHILTERN WOOD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1001048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 September 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 September 2021 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required