Financial history FRIENDS OF CHILTERN WOOD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1001048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.93k £3.78k £5.00k £5.13k £7.48k
Total expenditure £31.13k £111 £300 £8.37k £11.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A