E C ROBERTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help disabled and disadvantaged children living in the Cityof Portsmouth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 07 December 1990: Standard registration
- ROBERTS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP OF PORTSMOUTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £6.65k | £5.66k | £5.20k | £3.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £17.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 November 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1976 AND PROVED IN NEW JERSEY USA ON 25TH JULY 1977
Charitable objects
TO HELP FEED CARE FOR AND CLOTHE THE POOR CHILDREN, THE ORPHANS AND ESPECIALLY THE CRIPPLED AND BLIND CHILDREN OF THE TOWN OF PORTSMOUTH
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
PENINSULAR HOUSE
WHARF ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO2 8HB
- Phone:
- 02392899668
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window