Financial history CATSFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.40k £23.11k £18.45k £12.82k £16.20k
Total expenditure £15.33k £13.13k £14.20k £26.10k £18.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10.00k £8.92k N/A N/A