BEANFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a community centre for the benefit of local residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,710 from 4 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 December 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Owen | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Irwin | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.33k | £50.13k | £39.31k | £37.99k | £54.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.25k | £32.44k | £32.38k | £43.26k | £52.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.66k | £48.38k | £27.66k | £11.91k | £13.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2022 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2022 | 522 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTIUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1989 AND AMENDED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT AND WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BEANFIELD AREA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
THE BEANFIELD AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beanfield Community Centre
Beanfield Avenue
CORBY
Northamptonshire
NN18 0AX
- Phone:
- 01536206080
- Email:
- BEANFIELDCENTRE@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window