Accounts and annual returns SELLY OAK COLLEGES (PERMANENT ENDOWMENTS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND

Charity number: 1001097
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2007 08 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 16 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 16 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2005 10 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 10 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2004 28 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 20 December 2004 On Time