SELLY OAK COLLEGES (PERMANENT ENDOWMENTS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity number: 1001097
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust awards grants to the University of Birmingham, partner organisations and students in accordance with its objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007
Total income: £56,583
Total expenditure: £1,553,790
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Birmingham City
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
- 17 April 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Organisation type:
Other names:
- SELLY OAK COLLEGES FUND A (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.89k | £42.02k | £46.99k | £56.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.05k | £53.00k | £61.34k | £1.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 08 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 16 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 16 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 10 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 10 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 28 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 20 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1922 AND SCHEME OF 21 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TEACHING IN RELIGIOUS,SOCIAL ECONOMIC EDUCATION
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window