OAK WOOD SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oak Wood Schools Association exists to raise funds to support the pupils of Oak Wood schools in the areas of extra equipment and resources. Most of the equipment is of a specialist nature, that enhances the development of pupils with Profound multiple, Severe and moderate learning disabilities. The Association also raises funds to provide the schools with minibuses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 September 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
- LEYLAND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA BAYLISS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NATALIE JANE MORGAN | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TUTCHENER | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TUTCHNENER | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE BAYLISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/09/2018 | 15/09/2019 | 15/09/2020 | 15/09/2021 | 15/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 291 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 291 days | |
Annual return | 15 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 September 2019 | 18 August 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 30 APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK WOOD SCHOOLS
MORRIS DRIVE
NUNEATON
WARWICKSHIRE
CV11 4QH
- Phone:
- 02476740901
- Email:
- AMYLIZ26@SKY.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window