Manadon Vale PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide additional items for the school - this year the major expenditure was on the outdoor classroom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 17 December 1990: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF MANADON VALE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Louise Frearson | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karina Cinque | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mercy Louise Winters | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Jeannetee Evans | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Rachael Riley | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £320 | £3.73k | £8.66k | £17.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24k | £1.34k | £2.43k | £3.08k | £22.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTUTION ADOPTED 24TH APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1990 as amended on 06 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERMORE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT
Area of benefit
MANADON, PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manadon Vale Primary School
St. Peters Road
PLYMOUTH
PL5 3DL
- Phone:
- 01752705345
- Email:
- manadonvaleptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window