Accounts and annual returns THE COLLABORATE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1001138
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 June 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 25 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required