THE COLLABORATE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Collaborate Foundation seeks to advance the importance of collaboration in the production of improved social outcomes and knowledge about how to collaborate successfully in practice. The Collaborate Foundation brings together practitioners, thinkers and influencers and conducts research and public debate to further this aim.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1990: Standard registration
- 15 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE PUBLIC MANAGEMENT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.22k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £376 | £15.51k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 June 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 25 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF PUBLIC MANAGEMENT AND TO FURTHER RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO PUBLIC MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window